EP0495324 - Anti-slip system for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIEDSIGNAL EUROPE SERVICES TECHNIQUES 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states ALLIEDSIGNAL EUROPE SERVICES TECHNIQUES 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states BENDIX EUROPE Services Techniques S.A. 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebret, Pierre, BENDIX EUROPE Services Techniques, 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies 16, rue Gambetta 25000 Besançon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies Cabinet Ballot 25A Rue Proudhon 25000 Besançon / FR | ||
Former [1994/33] | Bentz, Jean-Paul AlliedSignal Europe Services Techniques Service Brevets 126, Rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403127.3 | 20.11.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | FR19900016025 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9016025 | [1992/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495324 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495324 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/48 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
B60T8/5012 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
B60T8/4291 (EP,US);
B60T8/4872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/30] | Title | German: | Antirutschsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1992/30] | English: | Anti-slip system for motor vehicles | [1992/30] | French: | Système d'antipatinage pour véhicule automobile | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0156323 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0182374 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]FR2590217 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]); | [A]EP0319719 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2218479 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]FR2636575 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3939177 (NIPPON ABS LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0376788 (BENDIX FRANCE [FR]) |