EP0490769 - Aminoalkylketone derivatives, process for their preparation and their therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATOIRE L. LAFON 19 Avenue du Professeur Cadiot 94701 Maisons Alfort / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states LABORATOIRE L. LAFON 19 Avenue du Professeur Cadiot F-94701 Maisons Alfort / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafon, Louis 5, rue de l'Alboni F-75016 Paris / FR | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403374.1 | 12.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | FR19900015591 | 12.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015591 | [1992/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490769 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490769 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/22, C07D409/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/445, A61K31/535, A61K31/41, A61K31/55 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (KR);
A61P9/08 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D333/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Aminoalkylketonderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre therapeutischen Anwendungen | [1992/25] | English: | Aminoalkylketone derivatives, process for their preparation and their therapeutical use | [1992/25] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés d'aminoalkycétone, leur procédé de préparation et leurs applications en thérapeutique | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.04.1995 | AT | 12.12.1995 | DK | 12.12.1995 | GB | 12.12.1995 | SE | 13.12.1995 | BE | 31.12.1995 | CH | 31.12.1995 | LI | 31.12.1995 | LU | 31.12.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1997/28] | AT | 12.12.1995 | |
DK | 12.12.1995 | ||
GB | 12.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
CH | 31.12.1995 | ||
LI | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | DK | 12.12.1995 | |
GB | 12.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/14] | DK | 12.12.1995 | |
GB | 12.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DK | 12.12.1995 | |
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/52] | SE | 13.12.1995 | |
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 13.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR3414M (BELLON LABOR SA ROGER [FR]); | [AD]FR2134218 (PENCIOLELLI MADELEINE [FR]); | [A]DE2552151 (DELALANDE SA); | [A]FR2453172 (INNOTHERA LAB SA [FR]); | [A]EP0193875 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |