EP0490793 - Compression bandage with standardization means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPIC DIFFUSION SA Rue des Pâquiers, 20 CH-2072 SAINT-BLAISE / CH | [1995/35] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states MOLINIER S.A. rue des Siccards F-42340 Veauche / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delannoy Robert 3 rue Chernoviz 75016 - Paris / FR | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian, et al BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Derambure, Christian, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/35] | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1992/25] | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91420439.1 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | FR19900015877 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015877 | [1992/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490793 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490793 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
A61F13/00059 (EP,US);
A61F13/085 (EP,US);
A61F13/0273 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00123 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00153 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8497 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Kompressionsbandage mit Normungsmittel | [1992/25] | English: | Compression bandage with standardization means | [1992/25] | French: | Bande de contention avec moyen d'étalonnage | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | DK | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | NL | 22.05.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | BE | 31.12.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | |
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2329371 (VOS PETER DE DR MED); | [AD]FR2544982 (THUASNE & CIE [FR]); | [A]GB2180161 (KENDALL & CO); | [Y]DE3640979 (RAUSCHER & CO [AT]) |