EP0490827 - Antipanic pushbar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNI SERRATURE S.r.L. Via J. Peri, 68 I-41010 Saliceto Panaro (Modena) / IT | [1992/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mescoli, Franco Via Albareto, 67 I-41100 Modena / IT | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 25 I-41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 91830405.6 | 30.09.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | IT19900040169 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: IT 4016990 | [1992/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490827 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/10 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
E05B65/1046 (EP);
E05B63/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1992/25] | Title | German: | Panik-Stangengriff | [1992/25] | English: | Antipanic pushbar | [1992/25] | French: | Barre antipanique | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/52] | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB219961 (SOIE ARTIFICIELLE DE TUBIZE SA); | [A]US2962889 (MCCONNELL FRANK J) |