|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.01.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.12.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.09.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.06.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2002 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
33 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.05.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |