EP0478797 - NOVEL PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PEPTIDE ORIGINATING IN HOG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsuo, Hisayuki 4-24-204, Nishiokamoto 6-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states Matsuo, Hisayuki 4-24-204, Nishiokamoto 6-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91908466.5 | 20.04.1991 | [1992/15] | WO1991JP00527 | Priority number, date | JP19900105047 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10504790 | [1992/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116342 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478797 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478797 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/58, A61K38/22 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/58 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | C07K7/10, A61K37/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | NEUE IM SCHWEIN VORKOMMENDE PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVE PEPTIDE | [1992/15] | English: | NOVEL PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PEPTIDE ORIGINATING IN HOG | [1992/15] | French: | NOUVEAU PEPTIDE A ACTIVITE PHYSIOLOGIQUE D'ORIGINE PORCINE | [1992/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1991 | Translation filed | 20.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1991 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS. vol. 170, no. 2, 31 July 1990, DULUTH, MINNESOTA US pages 973 - 979 N MINAMINO ET AL. 'N-terminally extended form of c-type natriuretic peptide (CNP-53) identified in porcine brain' | [XP] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS. vol. 172, no. 2, 30 October 1990, DULUTH, MINNESOTA US pages 627 - 632 Y TAWARAGI ET AL. 'gene and precursor structure of porcine c-type natriuretic peptide' | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 115, no. 1, 8 July 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 9329q, Y FUJIWARA ET AL. 'syntheses of several newly isolated natriuretic peptides' page 916 ;column LEFT ; | International search | [P] - Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., Vol. 168, No. 2 (1990), TETSUJI SUDOH et al. "C-type natriuretic peptide (CNP): a new member of natriuretic peptide family identified in procine brain" pp. 863-870. | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts Vol. 112, 1990, page 88, Abstract no. 129047 |