|
28.11.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.11.2001 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.2001 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.04.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.11.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.04.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1997 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.09.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
18.10.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.1993 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.10.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.11.1991 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
23.05.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |