EP0551332 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAKING AND BREAKING JOINTS IN DRILL PIPE STRINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWK INDUSTRIES, INC. 1245 East 23rd Street Long Beach, CA 90806 / US | [1993/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUK, Thomas, D. 10422 El Dorado Way Los Alamitos, CA 90720 / US | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91917162.9 | 28.08.1991 | [1993/29] | WO1991US06162 | Priority number, date | US19900596774 | 12.10.1990 Original published format: US 596774 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207164 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551332 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551332 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/16 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
E21B19/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN UND AUFBRECHEN VON VERBINDUNGEN IN BOHRROHRSTRÄNGEN | [1993/29] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAKING AND BREAKING JOINTS IN DRILL PIPE STRINGS | [1993/29] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE ET DEFAIRE DES RACCORDS DANS DES TRAINS DE TIGES DE FORAGE | [1993/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1993 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3122952 ; | [A]US3246547 (O'NEILL JOSEPH V, et al); | [A]US3799009 (GUIER W); | [A]GB2100639 (JOY MFG CO [US]); | [A]US4437363 (HAYNES CHARLES W [US]); | [A]US4515045 (GNATCHENKO VIKTOR V [SU], et al); | [A]US4727781 (YUEHUI CHEN [CN], et al); | [AP]US5040438 (ROUSSEAU JOSEPH E R [CA]) | International search | [X]US1676507 (NINKO SPANOVIC); | [Y]US2633045 (LURIE BENJAMIN L); | [Y]US2787181 (MONTGOMERY GEORGE E) |