EP0504350 - ANTIBODIES DIRECTED AGAINST CD3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states GORMAN, Scott, David 167 Cambridge Road Great Shelford Cambridge CB2 5JN / GB | ||
For all designated states ROUTLEDGE, Edward, Graham 53 Eland way, Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 4XQ / GB | |||
For all designated states Waldmann, Herman 11 Gurney Way Cambridge CB4 2ED / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorman, Scott David 167 Cambridge Road Great Shelford, Cambridge CB2 5JN / GB | 02 /
Routledge, Edward Graham 53 Eland Way, Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 4XQ / GB | 03 /
Waldmann, Herman 11 Gurney Way Cambridge CB4 2ED / GB | [1998/02] |
Former [1992/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Percy, Richard Keith, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Percy, Richard Keith, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | Stephenson, Gerald Frederick Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91917169.4 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/39] | WO1991GB01726 | Priority number, date | GB19900021679 | 05.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9021679 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206193 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504350 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504350 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C07K16/00, C12P21/08, A61K39/395 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/464 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/51 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | C12N15/13, C07K15/28, C12P21/08, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/39] | Title | German: | GEGEN CD3 GERICHTETE ANTIKÖRPER | [1992/39] | English: | ANTIBODIES DIRECTED AGAINST CD3 | [1992/39] | French: | ANTICORPS A EFFICACITE ANTIGONISTE A L'ANTIGENE CD3 | [1992/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.07.1998 | DK | 29.10.1998 | SE | 29.10.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 29.07.1998 | |
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | SE | 29.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0336379 (ONCOGEN [US]) | [Y] - European Journal of Immunogology, volume 19, 1989, VCH Verlagsgesellschaft (Weinheim, DE) M. Clark et al.: "The improved lytic function and in vivo efficacy of monovalent monoclonal CD3 antibodies", pages 381-388, see pages 383, 384, paragraph 1 (cited in the applicaton) | [Y] - Clinical Chemistry, volume 35, no. 9, 1989, G.P. Moore: "Genetically engineered antibodies", pages 1849-1853, see the whole article, especially pages 1852, 1853 | Examination | WO9109968 | - L. Riechmann et al., Nature, 332, 24 March 1988, 323-327 | - E. G. Routledge et al., Eur. J. Immunol. 1991, 21: 2717-2725 |