EP0554305 - TOMOGRAPH ACQUISITION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGE, Kai Kovaingen 14 DK-2950 Vedbaik / DK | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 Rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91918468.9 | 23.10.1991 | [1993/32] | WO1991EP02045 | Priority number, date | DK19900002577 | 26.10.1990 Original published format: DK 257790 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207512 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554305 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554305 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, G01T1/164 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
A61B6/035 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
G01T1/1644 (EP,US);
G01T1/1648 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4014 (EP,US);
A61B6/4266 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1993/32] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR TOMOGRAPHENERFASSUNG | [1993/32] | English: | TOMOGRAPH ACQUISITION APPARATUS | [1993/32] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACQUISITION DE TOMOGRAPHES | [1993/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 31.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3221955 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4368389 (BLUM ALVIN S [US]); | [A]EP0092437 (TECHNICARE CORP [US]); | [A]US4590378 (PLATZ WINFRIED [US]) |