|
03.08.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.05.2004 |
|
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
02.04.2004 |
|
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.02.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.02.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.11.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.04.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1992 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |