EP0495500 - Charge transfer device equipped with charge signal detector improved in sensitivity as well as in voltage amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miwada, Kazuo, c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100678.9 | 16.01.1992 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | JP19910004193 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: JP 419391 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0495500 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0495500 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495500 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11C19/28, H04N5/217 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
G11C19/285 (EP,US);
H04N25/60 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/30] | G11C19/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/30] | Title | German: | Ladungsübertragungsanordnung mit Ladungssignaldetektor mit verbesserter Empfindlichkeit sowie mit verbesserter Spannungsverstärkung | [1992/30] | English: | Charge transfer device equipped with charge signal detector improved in sensitivity as well as in voltage amplification | [1992/30] | French: | Dispositif de transfert de charge équipé d'un détecteur de signal de charge ayant une sensibilité améliorée ainsi qu'une amplification de tension améliorée | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 04.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0272688 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0390205 (SONY CORP [JP]) |