blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0497372

EP0497372 - Fluorescent image densitometer of flying spot system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.04.1997 [1997/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shimadzu Corporation
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/32]For all designated states
SHIMADZU CORPORATION
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho
Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sinya, Kazunari
5-40-6, Nanpeidai, Takatuki-shi
Osaka 569 / JP
[1992/32]
Representative(s)Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/32]WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date92101626.731.01.1992
[1992/32]
Priority number, dateJP1991003250831.01.1991         Original published format: JP 3250891
[1992/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0497372
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0497372
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.1992
ClassificationIPC:G01N30/95, G01N21/59
[1992/32]
CPC:
G01N30/95 (EP,US); G01N21/6456 (EP,US); G01N30/8613 (EP,US);
G01N30/90 (EP,US)
C-Set:
G01N30/90, G01N30/463 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/32]
TitleGerman:Fluoreszenzbild-Densitometer mit Lichtpunktsystem[1992/32]
English:Fluorescent image densitometer of flying spot system[1992/32]
French:Densitomètre d'image fluorescente à système de point de balayage[1992/32]
Examination procedure26.08.1992Examination requested  [1992/43]
19.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1995Fee for grant paid
26.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP62240842  ;
 [A]US3924948  (THODEN JOHN, et al);
 [A]DE2537343  (SHIMADZU CORP);
 [A]US4117338  (ADRION ROBERT F, et al);
 [A]EP0080699  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]);
 [A]US4762412  (OHKUBO KUNIHIKO [JP], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 112 (P-687)(2959) 9 April 1988 & JP-A-62 240 842 ( SHIMADZU CORP. ) 21 October 1987, & JP62240842 A 19871021
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.