EP0504770 - Standing-table with a conical supporting foot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/39] | Standing-table with hollow supporting foot and table top | ||
[1996/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.W.M. Import und Export GmbH & Co. Warenvertriebs KG Hans-Striegl-Strasse 5 D-92637 Weiden / DE | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilbert, Bruno Schönfelder Strasse 13 W-6452 Hainburg 2 / DE | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Schickedanz, Willi, Dipl.-Ing. Langener Strasse 68 D-63073 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104470.7 | 16.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914108940 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108940 | DE19914114422 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114422 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504770 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504770 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47B7/02, A47B13/02 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
A47B7/02 (EP,US);
A47B13/023 (EP,US);
A47B2013/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/39] | Title | German: | Stehtisch mit einem sich konisch verjüngenden Standfuss | [1996/39] | English: | Standing-table with a conical supporting foot | [1996/39] | French: | Table debout avec pied d'appui conique | [1996/39] |
Former [1992/39] | Stehtisch mit einem hohl ausgebildeten Standfuss und einer Tischplatte | ||
Former [1992/39] | Standing-table with hollow supporting foot and table top | ||
Former [1992/39] | Table de bout avec pied d'appui et plateau de table | Examination procedure | 22.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.09.1996 | ES | 25.09.1996 | FR | 25.09.1996 | GB | 25.09.1996 | GR | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | NL | 25.09.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | PT | 26.12.1996 | AT | 16.03.1997 | BE | 31.03.1997 | CH | 31.03.1997 | LI | 31.03.1997 | LU | 31.03.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
NL | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
ES | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
AT | 16.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
CH | 31.03.1997 | ||
LI | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/30] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | SE | 25.12.1996 | |
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR794102 (XAVIER PAUCHARD ETS); | [X]FR2573968 (TONARELLI ROLAND [FR]) |