EP0521251 - Baking oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Detterbeck, Heinrich Martin-Lutherstrasse 16 W-8225 Traunreut / DE | [1993/01] | Application number, filing date | 92106367.3 | 13.04.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914122041 | 03.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122041 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521251 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521251 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/16 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
F24C15/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Backofen | [1993/01] | English: | Baking oven | [1993/01] | French: | Four | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3813509 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0147815 (ELEKTRA BREGENZ GMBH [AT]) |