EP0512444 - Method of making of blow-moulded article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus D-95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92107476.1 | 02.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914115236 | 10.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4115236 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512444 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512444 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C69/02, B29C67/22, B29C49/04 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
B29C44/146 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29K2105/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Blasformkörpers | [1992/46] | English: | Method of making of blow-moulded article | [1992/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un article moulé par soufflage | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 02.05.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1629543 (MAAR KG PUPPEN); | [A]FR2110196 (AL FURNITURE LTD DU); | [A]GB2143465 (BOURGUIGNONNE PLASTIQUE); | [X]US4546899 (WILLIAMS W JERRY [US]); | [A]EP0306923 (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) |