EP0515975 - High enthalpy plasma torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORANDA INC. P.O. Box 45 Suite 4500 Commerce Court West Toronto Ontario, M5L 1B6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states NORANDA INC. P.O. Box 45 Suite 4500 Commerce Court West Toronto Ontario, M5L 1B6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsantrizos, Peter G. 147 Hillcrest Ville St-Pierre, Quebec H8R 1J3 / CA | 02 /
Lachance, Raynald 388 Olympique Pincourt, Quebec J7V 6N6 / CA | 03 /
Henshaw, Bruce 756 Daniel St. RR. No. 1 Rigaud, Quebec J0P 1P0 / CA | 04 /
Mavropoulos, Lakis T. 2930 Edouard Montpetit, Apt. 201 Montréal, Quebec H3T 1J7 / CA | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108547.8 | 20.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | CA19912043504 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: CA 2043504 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0515975 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0515975 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515975 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34, H05H1/28 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
H05H1/34 (EP,US);
H05H1/28 (EP);
H05H1/3431 (EP);
H05H1/3442 (EP);
H05H1/3468 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/49] | Title | German: | Hochenthalpie-Plasmabrenner | [1992/49] | English: | High enthalpy plasma torch | [1992/49] | French: | Tuyère à plasma à enthalpie élevée | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3104310 (ROBERT MOSS ASHLEY); | [Y]US3139509 (BROWNING JAMES A); | [A]US3301995 (ESCHENBACH RICHARD C, et al); | [Y]US3567898 (FEIN SAMUEL); | [Y]BE896448 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE); | [A]FR2539942 (PLASMA ENERGY CORP [US]); | [Y]US4668853 (FEY MAURICE G [US], et al); | [Y]GB2213636 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]US4928027 (DEININGER WILLIAM D [US], et al) |