|
13.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2000 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.01.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
22.05.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.1992 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1992 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1992 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1992 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |