EP0524446 - Grab unit mounted on floats for the production of sand and gravel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohr GmbH Speyererstrasse 74-80 D-67166 Otterstadt / DE | [1993/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohr, Wolfgang Zeppelinstr. 16 W - 6720 Speyer Rh. / DE | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter Reble & Klose Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110703.3 | 25.06.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | DE19910008952U | 20.07.1991 Original published format: DE 9108952 U | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524446 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524446 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/47 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
E02F3/4131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1993/04] | Title | German: | Schwimmgreiferanlage für die Gewinnung von Sand und Kies | [1993/04] | English: | Grab unit mounted on floats for the production of sand and gravel | [1993/04] | French: | Benne preneuse montée sur flotteurs pour la production de sable et gravier | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE37496 ; | [A]GB667641 (ALBERT JAMES KELMAN, et al); | [A]GB719113 (PRIESTMAN BROTHERS); | [A]FR1156515 (BRETAGNE ATEL CHANTIERS); | [A]FR1409858 ; | [A]US4231172 (HEWITT JAMES A); | [A]DE8609272U |