|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
New French translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
New German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
34 |
|
10.04.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
23 |
|
30.03.2006 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.01.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.05.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Communication on file inspection (Information section) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.1993 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1993 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |