EP0523739 - Dynamic pressure bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Masayoshi 545-1-302, Nagasone-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Takeshi 6-10-309, Hinode-nishihonmachi Yamatotakada-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/03] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112281.8 | 17.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | JP19910056437U | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 5643791 U | JP19920011794U | 10.03.1992 Original published format: JP 1179492 U | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523739 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523739 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/10 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
F16C17/026 (EP,US);
F16C33/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1993/03] | Title | German: | Dynamische Drucklagervorrichtung | [1993/03] | English: | Dynamic pressure bearing device | [1993/03] | French: | Dispositif de palier dynamique | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2036036 ; | [Y]CH447863 (DECKEL HANS DR ING [DE], et al); | [A]US3238000 (ALBERTUS MUIJDERMAN EVERHARDUS, et al); | [A]DE2711983 (DAIDO METAL CO LTD); | [A]FR2193441 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US3778123 (HENDLER H, et al) | Examination | GB2235736 |