EP0528216 - Method and apparatus for filling containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES AG Hermann Kronseder Maschinenfabrik Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 Postfach 1230 D-93068 Neutraubling / DE | [1993/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Wilhelm Margeritenstrasse 6 W-8417 Lappersdorf / DE | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112874.0 | 28.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | DE19914127052 | 16.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4127052 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528216 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/28 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B67C3/285 (EP);
B67C3/00 (KR);
B67C2003/2685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Füllen von Behältern | [1993/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for filling containers | [1993/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de remplissage de récipients | [1993/08] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0268524 (MAPCO [FR]); | [YD]DE3245731 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF [DE]); | [Y]EP0341626 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]); | [Y]FR2516495 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]); | [Y]DE9016401U ; | [Y]FR2074379 (SEITZ WERKE GMBH) |