|
12.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.07.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.06.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.11.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |