|
07.12.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
48 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.04.2003 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.02.2003 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.11.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.09.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1996 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.1995 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1995 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.12.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |