EP0532047 - Method of making photographic prints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terashita, Takaaki, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kinjo, Naoto, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kanafusa, Kunihiko, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Ikenoue, Shinpei, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115616.2 | 11.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | JP19910261125 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26112591 | JP19910261126 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26112691 | JP19910286901 | 31.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28690191 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0532047 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0532047 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532047 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03B7/091, G03B27/80 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
G03B27/735 (EP,US);
G03B27/80 (EP,US);
G03B7/09979 (EP,US);
G03B2206/006 (EP,US);
G03B2217/243 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/11] | G03B27/80 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung photographischer Kopien | [1993/11] | English: | Method of making photographic prints | [1993/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'épreuves photographiques | [1999/02] |
Former [1993/11] | Procédé de fabrication pour les épreuves photographiques | Miscellaneous | EPB 1999/02: (deleted) | EPB 1999/02: (deleted) | EPB 1999/02: (deleted) | EPB 1997/44: Teilanmeldung 97113233.7 eingereicht am 31/07/97 | EPB 1997/44: Divisional application 97113233.7 filed on 31/07/97 | EPB 1997/44: Demande divisionnaire 97113233.7 déposée le 31/07/97 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97113233.7 / EP0821265 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2240512 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2,10 [A] 8,9,11,16-19; | [YA]GB2176677 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,2,10 [A] 8,11-15,17-19; | [A]US4969005 (TOKUNAGA TATSUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-21; | [A]DE3620525 (JEMCO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-21; | [A]DE3913803 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-8,10-15,17; | [A]EP0443497 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,7-12,13-21; | [A]EP0246010 (CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10-12,14,15,17-19 | Examination | EP0341921 | US5023656 | US5029312 |