blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0532052

EP0532052 - Method for extracting object images and method for detecting movements thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2008
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1993/11]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ono, Shuji, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
798 Miyanodai, Kaisai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1993/11]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/11]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date92115724.414.09.1992
[1993/11]
Priority number, dateJP1991023321312.09.1991         Original published format: JP 23321391
JP1991032334206.12.1991         Original published format: JP 32334291
JP1991032334306.12.1991         Original published format: JP 32334391
JP1991032334406.12.1991         Original published format: JP 32334491
JP1992001309228.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309292
JP1992001309328.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309392
JP1992001309428.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309492
JP1992001309528.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309592
JP1992001309628.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309692
JP1992001309728.01.1992         Original published format: JP 1309792
[1993/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0532052
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0532052
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0532052
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1994
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/32, G06K9/48, G06K9/66
[2007/34]
CPC:
G06T7/246 (EP,US); G06T7/254 (EP,US); G06V10/24 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US); G06V10/454 (EP,US); G06V10/46 (EP,US);
G06V30/194 (EP,US); G06V40/168 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1994/15]G06K9/32, G06F15/70, G06K9/48, G06K9/66
Former IPC [1993/11]G06K9/32, G06F15/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Objektbildern und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Bewegung davon[1993/11]
English:Method for extracting object images and method for detecting movements thereof[1993/11]
French:Procédé d'extraction d'images d'objet et procédé de détection de mouvement de l'objet[1993/11]
Examination procedure09.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/32]
07.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2000Date of oral proceedings
27.12.2000Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2007Fee for grant paid
20.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination14.03.2001Appeal received No.  T0634/01
23.05.2001Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2004/10]
15.07.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/29]
18.01.2005Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
18.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP05000707.9   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 15.02.2005
Opposition(s)14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 13
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 14
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.09.2008
FR30.09.2008
[2010/05]
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - HIMES G.S. ET AL., "VLSI implementable neural networks for traget tracking", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE, APPLICATIONS OF ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS II, ORLANDE, FLORIDA, USA, (19910405), vol. 1469, no. 2, pages 671 - 682 [Y] 1-179
 [Y]  - MEHANIA C., RAK S.J., "Bi-directional Log-polar Mapping for Invariant Object Recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIEE CONFERENCE, AUTOMATIC OBJECT RECOGNITION, ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA, (19910405), vol. 1471, pages 200 - 209 [Y] 1-179
 [Y]  - GAWRONSKI R.R., LITTLEFIELD M.L., "Experimental optimization of the Neuronlike Network applied for the processing og moving images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE, APPLICATIONS OF ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE VIII, ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA, (19900419), vol. 1293, no. 2, pages 838 - 849 [Y] 1-179
 [A]  - LEE J.S.J., LIN C., "An Intelligent Real-Time Multiple Moving Object Tracker", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE, APPLICATIONS OF ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE VI, ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA, (19880406), vol. 937, pages 328 - 335, XP000044424 [A] 1-179
 [A]  - ZHOU Y.T., CHELLAPPA R., "Computation of Optical Flow Using A Neural Network", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS,, SHERATON HARBOR ISLAND, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, (19880727), pages 71 - 78, XP000043047 [A] 1-179
 [A]  - WELLER G.A., GROEN F.C.A, "A GRADIENT COMPARISON METHOD FOR TRACKING AND FOCUSING PURPOSES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, TIME-VARYING IMAGE PROCESSING AND MOVING OBJECT RECOGNITION 2,, FLORENCE, ITALY, (19890531), pages 316 - 322 [A] 1-179
 [A]  - GRATTONI P., POLLASTRI F., "A Contour Detection Algorithm Based on the Minimum Radial Inertia (MRI) Criterion", COMPUTER VISION GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, DULUTH, MA US, (198807), vol. 43, no. 1, pages 22 - 36 [A] 1-179
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.