|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
01.04.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.11.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.11.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.05.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.1993 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |