EP0536792 - Audio sound recording/reproducing apparatus using semiconductor memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Kousou 130-184, Shouriki, Hachihonmatsu-cho Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Koike, Tadashi 140-39, Shouriki, Hachihonmatsu-cho Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/15] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117330.8 | 09.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | JP19910263654 | 11.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26365491 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0536792 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0536792 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536792 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G11C8/00 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F3/16 (EP,US);
G06F40/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/38] | G06K19/07, G11C7/00, G06F15/20, G11C8/00 | ||
Former IPC [1993/15] | G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/15] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Aufzeichnung/Wiedergabe von Audiotönen mit einem Halbleiterspeicher | [1993/15] | English: | Audio sound recording/reproducing apparatus using semiconductor memory | [1993/15] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction de sons audio utilisant une mémoire à semi-conducteur | [1993/15] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS648949 ; | [A]JPS6491292 ; | [A]JPH01270192 ; | [X]EP0065148 (LANIER BUSINESS PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2170037 (DICTAPHONE CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0294201 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 8,9; | [A]EP0406744 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 4, column 6, line 19 - page 5, column 7, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO9108572 (THOME MAGNUS [SE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document * [A] 6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890426), vol. 13, no. 179, & JP01008949 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENKI SANEI KK) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890721), vol. 13, no. 324, & JP01091292 A 00000000 (HITACHI) [A] 3,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900123), vol. 14, no. 35, & JP01270192 A 00000000 (ASAHI GLASS CO LDT) [A] 3,5 * abstract * |