EP0554516 - Package for a core-wound band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANDSBERGER BANDWEBEREI GMBH & CO. KG Justus-von Liebig-Strasse 13 D-86899 Landsberg / DE | [1993/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackenberg, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. FH Westermühlstrasse 6 W-8000 München 5 / DE | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118215.0 | 23.10.1992 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | DE19920001407U | 05.02.1992 Original published format: DE 9201407 U | [1993/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554516 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554516 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/672, B65D75/02 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
B65D75/02 (EP);
B65D85/672 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/32] | B65D85/672 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1993/32] | Title | German: | Verpackung für ein auf einer Spule aufgewickeltes Band | [1993/32] | English: | Package for a core-wound band | [1993/32] | French: | Conditionnement pour bandes embobinées en rouleau | [1993/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/52] | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CH380649 (MINNESOTA MINING) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document * [A] 4-6; | [A]BE465153 (BRUSSELMANS) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2329521 (INTERELCO) [A] 4-6 * figure -; claim 1 * |