|
24.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
02.01.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
20.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
20 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.08.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
21 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.1994 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.11.1992 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |