EP0545121 - Vacuum boost valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/23] | Vauum boost valve | ||
[1997/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS ELECTRIC LIMITED 700 Park Avenue East Chatham Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS ELECTRIC LIMITED 700 Park Avenue East Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | ||
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Ltd. 540 Park Avenue East Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, John-Edward 17 Kingsway Drive CDN Chatham, Ontario N7L2S8 / CA | 02 /
Gillier, C. William RR. No. 4 CDN Chatham, Ontario / CA | 03 /
Busato, F. Murray 304-97 Bedford Street CDN Chatham, Ontario N7L 2V4 / CA | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119467.6 | 13.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | US19910801986 | 03.12.1991 Original published format: US 801986 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545121 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545121 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08, G05D16/18, B60T13/52, F02M25/07 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B60T13/52 (EP,US);
F02M25/0836 (EP,US);
Y10S137/907 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2567 (EP,US);
Y10T137/782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Unterdruckverstärkungsventil | [1993/23] | English: | Vacuum boost valve | [1997/05] | French: | Soupape d'amplification de dépression | [1993/23] |
Former [1993/23] | Vauum boost valve | Examination procedure | 15.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2533186 (NISSIN KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US4056334 (FORTUNE WILLIAM S); | [A]GB2017821 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED); | [A]DE2719816 (AUDI AG); | [A]US4328669 (MORT DEWEY F); | [AP]US5108266 (HEWITT WAYNE A [US]) |