|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.12.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
20 |
|
02.06.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.04.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
14.06.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |