|
04.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Communication of the Legal Board of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.1996 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1996 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1996 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Decision refusing a request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1996 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.1996 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.07.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
23 |