|
25.07.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.06.2002 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.05.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.04.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.04.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.12.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
06.05.1993 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |