EP0521568 - A low-nox gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | For all designated states Takagi Industrial Co., Ltd. 201, Nishikashiwabarashinden Fuji-shi Shizuoka-ken 417-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
For all designated states TAKAGI INDUSTRIES CO., Ltd. 201, Nishi Kashiwabara Shinden Fuji-shi, Shizuoka Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugahara, Tatsuya 52-5, Oyama Kanaichio Itabashiku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takagi, Takao 56 Nishi Kashiwabara Shinden Fuji-shi, Shizuoka Pref. / JP | 03 /
Mochizuki, Kimio 239-2, Kuroda, Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka Pref. / JP | 04 /
Akiyama, Shigetoshi 8-5, Utougawa Nishimachi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka Pref. / JP | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/01] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92201934.4 | 30.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910190919 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: JP 19091991 | JP19920103325 | 23.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10332592 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0521568 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0521568 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521568 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/26, F23D14/58 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
F23D14/26 (EP,US);
F23D14/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/01] | Title | German: | Gasbrenner mit niedrigem NOx-Gehalt | [1993/01] | English: | A low-nox gas burner | [1993/01] | French: | Brûleur à gaz à faible taux de NOx | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63259309 ; | [A]EP0331037 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO8706998 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3906795 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE8633823U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 052 (M-794)7 February 1989 & JP-A-63 259 309 ( OSAKA GAS CO ) 26 October 1988, & JP63259309 A 19881026 |