|
12.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.06.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.10.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1999 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1997 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1995 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
03.01.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.1993 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |