EP0529722 - Process for obtaining purified aqueous solutions of hydrogen peroxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY INTEROX (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1993/33] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states INTEROX INTERNATIONAL (Société Anonyme) Rue de l'Arbre Bénit, 21 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Signorini, Lido Rue Souveraine, 22 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Glinos, Konstantin Rue des Floralies, 83/123 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1993/09] | Decamps, Alain René François, et al SOLVAY & Cie S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 92202557.2 | 21.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | BE19910000787 | 27.08.1991 Original published format: BE 9100787 | [1993/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529722 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529722 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0529722 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/013, B01D53/18 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C01B15/013 (EP,US);
B01D3/14 (EP,US);
Y10S203/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von gereinigten wässrigen Wasserstoffperoxidlösungen | [1993/09] | English: | Process for obtaining purified aqueous solutions of hydrogen peroxide | [1993/09] | French: | Procédé pour l'obtention de solutions aqueuses épurées de peroxyde d'hydrogène | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1997
27.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Degussa-Hüls AG Patente und Marken Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1997
27.05.1997
ADMISSIBLE Degussa-Hüls AG Patente und Marken Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.1997
Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | 02.06.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.09.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.07.1996 | DK | 10.07.1996 | GR | 10.07.1996 | CH | 31.08.1996 | LI | 31.08.1996 | LU | 31.08.1996 | MC | 28.02.1997 | GB | 21.08.2001 | PT | 21.08.2001 | SE | 22.08.2001 | [2008/29] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 10.07.1996 | |
DK | 10.07.1996 | ||
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
GB | 21.08.2001 | ||
SE | 22.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 10.07.1996 | |
DK | 10.07.1996 | ||
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 03.03.1997 | ||
GB | 21.08.2001 | ||
SE | 22.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 10.07.1996 | |
DK | 10.07.1996 | ||
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
GB | 21.08.2001 | ||
SE | 22.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | DK | 10.07.1996 | |
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
GB | 21.08.2001 | ||
SE | 22.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 10.07.1996 | |
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
SE | 22.08.2001 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 10.07.1996 | |
GR | 10.07.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 10.07.1996 | |
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 31.08.1996 | |
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
MC | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/24] | MC | 28.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB452632 (LINDE EISMASCH AG); | [Y]CH362060 (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO [US]); | [AD]US3152052 (JENNEY THEODORE M, et al) |