|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
38 |
|
18.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2002 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.12.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1993 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |