EP0534572 - Bistable electrical relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLEC SYSTEMEN EN COMPONENTEN B.V. Bornsestraat 5 NL-7556 BH Hengelo / NL | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van de Ven, Nico Jan Bunningstraat 10 NL-7552 JB Hengelo / NL | 02 /
Kippers, Mannes Grote Maatweg 47 NL-7642 VK Wierden / NL | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 92202963.2 | 25.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | NL19910001630 | 26.09.1991 Original published format: NL 9101630 | [1993/13] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0534572 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0534572 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534572 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01H51/22, H01H50/58, H01H1/54, H01H73/00, H01H1/58 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
H01H89/06 (EP);
H01H1/54 (EP);
H01H1/5805 (EP);
H01H50/58 (EP);
H01H51/2209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Elektrisches bistabiles Relais | [1993/13] | English: | Bistable electrical relay | [1993/13] | French: | Relais électrique bistable | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH234220 (LUFTFAHRTGERAETEWERK HAKENFELD [DE]); | [X]US3014103 (MORAN DON E, et al); | [X]US4099151 (GRUNERT KURT A, et al); | [Y]GB2142188 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) |