EP0543472 - Collator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORIZON INTERNATIONAL INC. 1601 Aza Shironoshita Oaza Asahi Shinasahimachi Takashimagun Shiga / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states HORIZON INTERNATIONAL INC. 1601 Aza Shironoshita Oaza Asahi Shinasahimachi Takashimagun Shiga / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Koji 4 Matsumuro-Jikecho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 92250319.8 | 03.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | JP19910350560 | 05.11.1991 Original published format: JP 35056091 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543472 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543472 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/043, B65H39/06 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
B65H39/06 (EP,US);
B65H39/043 (EP,US);
B65H2301/434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/21] | Title | German: | Zusammentragmaschine | [1993/21] | English: | Collator | [1993/21] | French: | Assembleuse | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB654442 (KRISTIAN HOLMEN); | [X]FR813948 ; | [X]US3216719 (FLORA LELAND W); | [A]US3825247 (FERNANDEZ RANA V, et al); | [A]GB901816 (MUELLER HANS) |