EP0495570 - Silicon carbide fiber reinforced carbon composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL CARBON COMPOSITES, INC. 1600 West 135th Street Gardena, Los Angeles California 90249 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states SGL CARBON COMPOSITES, INC. 1600 West 135th Street Gardena, Los Angeles, California 90249 / US | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states HITCO TECHNOLOGIES Inc. 13722 Harvard Place Gardena, California 90249 / US | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states BP CHEMICALS ( HITCO) INC. 13722 Harvard Place Gardena, California 90249 / US | ||
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states HITCO 13722 Harvard Place Gardena, California 90249 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sam 15205 Budlong Nr. 24 Gardena, CA 90247 / US | 02 /
Mosher, Paul V. 2109A Pullman Lane Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1992/30] | Crack, Richard David BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300090.5 | 07.01.1992 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | US19910642097 | 16.01.1991 Original published format: US 642097 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495570 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495570 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B41/50 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP);
C04B35/521 (EP,US);
C04B35/524 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/6269 (EP);
C04B35/62868 (EP);
C04B35/62873 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B41/5001 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3804 (EP);
C04B2235/3813 (EP);
C04B2235/3821 (EP);
C04B2235/3826 (EP);
C04B2235/3873 (EP);
C04B2235/421 (EP);
C04B2235/422 (EP);
C04B2235/428 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP);
C04B2235/614 (EP);
C04B2235/663 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
C04B2235/9607 (EP);
C04B2235/9684 (EP);
C04B2237/363 (EP);
C04B2237/38 (EP);
Y10T428/2916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2918 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/30] | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoffe aus siliciumcarbidfaserarmiertem Kohlenstoff | [1992/30] | English: | Silicon carbide fiber reinforced carbon composites | [1992/30] | French: | Composites en carbone renforcé par fibres de carbure de silicium | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0127491 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]); | [Y]US4642271 (RICE ROY W [US]); | [X]US4894286 (GRAY PAUL E [US]) |