EP0494763 - Arrangement for monitoring the operating state of vehicle pneumatic tires mounted on wheel rims [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DK
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
AT
Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | For:DE
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Haggertystrasse 1 85356 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For:BE
CH
DK
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
AT
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | ||
For:DE
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Haggertystrasse 1 D-85356 Freising / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuerman, Josef An der Muhle 6 W-8051 Oberhummel / DE | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/49] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/29] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited Patents Department Manton Lane Bedford MK41 7PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92300135.8 | 08.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | DE19914100472 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4100472 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494763 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494763 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
B60C23/0461 (EP,US);
B60C23/0493 (EP,US);
B60C23/0498 (EP,US);
G06K19/07764 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/29] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Überwachung des Betriebsverfahrens von auf ihren Felgen montierten Fahrzeugreifen | [1992/29] | English: | Arrangement for monitoring the operating state of vehicle pneumatic tires mounted on wheel rims | [1992/29] | French: | Procédé de surveillance de l'état de fonctionnement des pneumatiques de véhicules montés sur leurs jantes | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.05.1996 | BE | 15.05.1996 | CH | 15.05.1996 | DK | 15.05.1996 | LI | 15.05.1996 | NL | 15.05.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.05.1996 | |
BE | 15.05.1996 | ||
CH | 15.05.1996 | ||
DK | 15.05.1996 | ||
LI | 15.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 15.05.1996 | |
BE | 15.05.1996 | ||
CH | 15.05.1996 | ||
LI | 15.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 15.05.1996 | |
BE | 15.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 15.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4067235 (MARKLAND RICHARD DONALD, et al); | [AD]DE3029563 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO8304224 (TIRE TRONICS INC [US]); | [AD]EP0301127 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) |