|
19.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Description |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.01.2002 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.04.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.02.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.08.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.03.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.03.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |