|
10.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Annex |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
46 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.03.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
44 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.10.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2006 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
37 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
62 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
62 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
42 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
44 |
|
31.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
47 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
156 |
|
02.10.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
148 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |