EP0498608 - Flexible magnetic disc cassettes with integrally molded wear button [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1992/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hughes, Patrick M. 47 Quarry Ridge Road Clinton, New Jersey / US | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1992/33] | Application number, filing date | 92300915.3 | 04.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | US19910650594 | 05.02.1991 Original published format: US 650594 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498608 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498608 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G11B23/0332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/33] | Title | German: | Flexible magnetische Scheibe Kassette mit einstückig gegossenem Zentriervorsprung | [1992/33] | English: | Flexible magnetic disc cassettes with integrally molded wear button | [1992/33] | French: | Cassette pour disque magnétique souple comprenant un bouton pivot moulé d'une seule pièce | [1992/33] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63086711 ; | [AD]US2768994 (NEAL MACDONALD ROBERT); | [A]US3147234 (POLLY JR GEORGE W); | [A]GB2161978 (TDK CORP); | [X]EP0192188 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [A]US4640949 (WAGMAN MARK E [US]); | [A]US4768123 (IIZUKA MICHIO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0351160 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 316 (C-524)26 August 1988 & JP-A-63 086 711 ( TORAY IND INC ) 18 April 1988, & JP63086711 A 19880418 |