EP0501712 - Surgery table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andrews, Trent E. 3580 California Street, Suite 102 San Fransisco California 94566 US / US | For all designated states Moore, Robert R. 1897 National Avenue Hayward California 94545 / US | For all designated states Lamb, Steven R. 1897 National Avenue Hayward California 94545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states Andrews, Trent E. 3580 California Street, Suite 102 San Fransisco, California 94566 US / US | ||
For all designated states Moore, Robert R. 1897 National Avenue Hayward, California 94545 / US | |||
For all designated states Lamb, Steven R. 1897 National Avenue Hayward, California 94545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/36] | Barker, Rosemary Anne MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92301509.3 | 24.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | US19910659726 | 25.02.1991 Original published format: US 659726 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501712 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0501712 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/12, A61G13/00 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
A61G13/12 (EP,US);
A61G13/00 (EP,US);
A61G13/0054 (EP,US);
A61G13/123 (EP,US);
A61G13/1245 (EP,US);
A61G2200/325 (EP,US);
A61G2200/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | Operationstisch | [1992/36] | English: | Surgery table | [1992/36] | French: | Table d'opération | [1992/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.07.1996 | BE | 17.07.1996 | CH | 17.07.1996 | DK | 17.07.1996 | ES | 17.07.1996 | GR | 17.07.1996 | IT | 17.07.1996 | LI | 17.07.1996 | NL | 17.07.1996 | SE | 17.10.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
ES | 17.07.1996 | ||
GR | 17.07.1996 | ||
IT | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
GR | 17.07.1996 | ||
IT | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
IT | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2577177 (ROGER ANDERSON); | [A]GB674682 (GEORGE SCHWALBE); | [A]GB856791 (RITTER CO INC); | [A]US2972505 (WEICKGENANNT EGON R); | [A]US3289674 (PLATT JOSEPH L); | [AD]US4662619 (RAY CHARLES D [US], et al); | [AD]US4718077 (MOORE ROBERT R [US], et al); | [A]EP0296872 (CEDAR SURGICAL INC [US]) |