EP0505104 - Space-saving optical fiber cable closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cobb, Gary Simpson 441 North Peachtree Street Norcross, Georgia 30071 / US | 02 /
Dunn, Lawrence Russell 4674 Martin Trail Flowery Branch, Georgia 30542 / US | 03 /
Evers, Melvin Wayne 344 Mephisto Circle Lawrenceville, Georgia 30245 / US | 04 /
Jones, Wesley Willing 591 Battersea Drive Lawrenceville, Georgia 30244 / US | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302163.8 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | US19910673880 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: US 673880 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505104 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505104 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G02B6/4471 (EP,US);
G02B6/4442 (EP,US);
G02B6/4454 (EP,US);
G02B6/4445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/39] | Title | German: | Raumsparende Verschlussvorrichtung für optisches Kabel | [1992/39] | English: | Space-saving optical fiber cable closure | [1992/39] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture pour câbles à fibre optique peu encombrant | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63138306 ; | [X]EP0367477 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0105597 (AMP INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 396 (P-774)21 October 1988 & JP-A-63 138 306 ( NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE ), & JP63138306 A 19881021 |