EP0521732 - Antenna system for receiving broadcast or communication signals from satellite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Yutaka c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kajiwara, Tadashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fukuzawa, Keiji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yuzawa, Keiji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306174.1 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910164103 | 04.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16410391 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0521732 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0521732 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521732 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0521732 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H1/02 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP,US);
H04H20/63 (EP,US);
H04H20/74 (EP,US);
H04H20/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/01] | Title | German: | Antennensystem zum Empfang von Rundfunk- oder Kommunikationssignalen von einem Satelliten | [1993/01] | English: | Antenna system for receiving broadcast or communication signals from satellite | [1993/01] | French: | Système d'antenne pour la réception de signaux de diffusion ou communication d'un satellite | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
15.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1999
15.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 05.11.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.02.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.11.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.12.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.01.2003 | Appeal received No. T0165/03 | 12.03.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.12.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 01.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9100646 (THOMSON COMPOSANTS MICROONDES [FR], et al); | [X]JPH0358251 ; | [A]JPS61281778 ; | [A]JPH01265688 ; | [A]GB2178274 (TOSHIBA KK); | [A]US4509198 (NAGATOMI AKIHIKO [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910528), vol. 15, no. 209, Database accession no. (E - 1072), & JP03058251 A 19910313 (FUJITSU) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870512), vol. 11, no. 145, Database accession no. (E - 505), & JP61281778 A 19861212 (TOSHIBA) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880418), vol. 14, no. 28, Database accession no. (E - 875), & JP01265688 A 19891023 (HITACHI) | Examination | EP0078494 | EP0314931 | DE3815560 | US4608710 | US4509198 | GB2178274 | - "USER MANUAL SSR-100", gedruckt von SATCOM INTERNATIONAL.SE&O, 21 June 1989 | - Bedienungsanleitung SSR-100/STOG 6066 | - "TV and Monitor Products", May 1986, pages 73 to 95 and 118 to 131 | - STOG Bedienungsanleitung SATELLITEN-RECEIVER 6066 |