EP0546836 - Thermally - sensitive record material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Wiggins Teape Group Limited P.O. Box 88 Gateway House Basing View Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 2EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states The Wiggins Teape Group Limited P.O. Box 88 Gateway House Basing View Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 2EE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damarell, Keith Brian 4 Poulton Crescent, Horton Preston, Lancashire PR5 OLY / GB | 02 /
Norrington, Paul Douglas 36 Greenlands Road Pickering, North Yorkshire YO18 8BQ / GB | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Norris, Richard John Intellectual Property Department, Arjo Wiggins Appleton plc, Butler's Court, Wattleton Road Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Norris, Richard John Intellectual Property Department, Arjo Wiggins Appleton plc, Butler's Court Beaconsfield, Buckinghamshire HP9 1RT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311305.4 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | GB19910026559 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126559 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546836 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546836 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/30 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B41M5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1993/24] | English: | Thermally - sensitive record material | [1993/24] | French: | Matériau pour l'enregistrement thermosensible | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62268684 ; | [X]JP61171383 ; | [XD]GB2110399 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 149 (M-694)(2996) 10 May 1988 & JP-A-62 268 684 ( HODOGAYA CHEMICALS K.K. ) 21 November 1987, & JP62268684 A 19871121 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 378 (M-546)(2435) 17 December 1986 & JP-A-61 171 383 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM COMPANY LIMITED ) 2 August 1986, & JP61171383 A 19860802 |