|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
52 |
|
18.04.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.04.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.01.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.08.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
10.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
29 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |